MD SB892 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB646
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Public Charter School Facility Fund to provide funding on an annual basis to public charter schools in the State for eligible expenses associated with school facilities; exempting the Fund from a requirement that interest earnings on State money accrue to the General Fund of the State; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to administer the Fund; and requiring the Fund to be used only to acquire, plan, develop, finance, construct, lease, improve, repair, and maintain public charter school facilities.
Title
School Construction - Public Charter School Facility Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {593429/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB646 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1061 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
HB1061 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Debt Management
Fuel
Governor
Interest
Leases and Rent
Mortgages
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Utilities
Weights and Measures
Budgets
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Debt Management
Fuel
Governor
Interest
Leases and Rent
Mortgages
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Utilities
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |