MD SB899 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain provision of law relating to the interception of an oral communication by a law enforcement officer using a body-worn digital recording device or electronic control device to provide that such interception is lawful under certain circumstances; requiring a policy developed and published by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to address the use of a body-worn camera by an off-duty law enforcement officer authorized to work secondary employment under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {418276/1 Adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB239 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Law Enforcement
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Recordings
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Recordings
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |