MD SB902 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in collaboration with the State Highway Administration, to identify and prioritize certain species whose habitat or movement corridors intersect with State highways and develop tools, technology, and techniques to identify certain State highway infrastructure locations; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to develop a methodology and a cost estimate for performing a statewide deer population survey on or before November 1, 2024; etc.
Title
Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-13) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {643620/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183826/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183826/1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1129 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-08 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative Agencies
Animals
Appropriations
Budgets
Claims
Comptroller
Conservation
Construction
Data
Electronic Government
Federal Aid
Fees
Flood Control
Gifts
Grants
Highways
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Interest
Intergovernmental Cooperation
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Investments
Maps and Charts
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
plants
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Standards and Best Practices
State Highway Administration
studies
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Administrative Agencies
Animals
Appropriations
Budgets
Claims
Comptroller
Conservation
Construction
Data
Electronic Government
Federal Aid
Fees
Flood Control
Gifts
Grants
Highways
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Interest
Intergovernmental Cooperation
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Investments
Maps and Charts
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
plants
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Standards and Best Practices
State Highway Administration
studies
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 2A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 2A-06.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |