MD SB909 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting health care practitioners and certain students and trainees from performing certain examinations on a patient who is under anesthesia or unconscious unless informed consent has been obtained from the patient, the examination is within the standard of care, the patient is unconscious and the examination is required for diagnostic or treatment purposes, or an emergency exists, it is impractical to obtain the patient's consent, and the examination is required for diagnostic or treatment purposes; etc.
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {216788/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {774539/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Drugs
Emergencies
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Students
Vulnerable Adults
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Drugs
Emergencies
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Students
Vulnerable Adults