MD SB916 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Board of Charles County Commissioners, the Charles County Board of Education, the Interagency Commission on School Construction, and the members of the Charles County Delegation of the General Assembly.
Title
Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB739 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Subjects
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Partnerships
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Partnerships
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset