MD SB917 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement for the distribution of specified proceeds that the Comptroller is required to pay to a licensee from video lottery terminals at a video lottery facility in Allegany County.
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |