MD SB917 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to issue a seasonal exceptional poultry hauling permit that authorizes specified axle configurations and specified increased weight limits while carrying live poultry from a farm to a processing facility from November 1 until April 30 annually in specified counties; requiring, before October 1 each year, each specified poultry processing facility to submit to the Administration a complete list of registered combinations of vehicles used for carrying live poultry; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2017-04-04 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {270317/1 Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {470813/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agriculture
Eastern Shore
Farmland
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Reports
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Eastern Shore
Farmland
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Reports
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures