MD SB928 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified preference to allow the preference to apply to the Blind Industries and Services of Maryland when subcontracting for supplies and services under specified circumstances.
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-28 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-02 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-24 | First Reading Senate Rules |