MD SB928 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Somerset County Sanitary Commission to request the county tax collector to conduct a sale of real property to enforce a lien representing specified unpaid benefit assessments or other specified charges in accordance with the same procedures governing the sale of property for delinquent property taxes; and authorizing the tax collector in Somerset County to conduct a county tax sale for the purpose of enforcing a specified lien.
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Mathias) Adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Generally
Environment
Liens
Real Property
Sanitary Districts
Somerset County
Tax Sales
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Generally
Environment
Liens
Real Property
Sanitary Districts
Somerset County
Tax Sales