MD SB928 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the personal property tax imposed on personal property of a grocery store that completes eligible construction and is located in a certain healthy food priority area; requiring the governing body of Prince George's County to designate what constitutes a healthy food priority area for purposes of the tax credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018; etc.
Title
Prince George’s County – Property Tax Credit – Grocery Stores
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {169635/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Construction
Food
Laws and Ordinances
Personal Property
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Retail Sales
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Food
Laws and Ordinances
Personal Property
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Retail Sales
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local