MD SB928 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition on the issuance of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in Carroll County; establishing a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in Carroll County; authorizing the Board to issue the license to a holder of a manufacturer's license; providing that the license authorizes the sale of any beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption and for off-premises consumption only of the beer, wine or liquor manufactured on the premises; prohibiting issuance of a license to a drugstore; providing a $500 annual fee.
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Carroll County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Carroll County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of