MD SB928 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Insurance Commissioner from removing from a certain list of reciprocal jurisdictions created and published by the Commissioner certain jurisdictions located outside the United States and certain jurisdictions in the United States that meet certain accreditation requirements.
Title
Insurance – Credit for Reinsurance Model Law – Reciprocal Jurisdictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2023-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 5 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 5 | 917 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |