MD SB941 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act; identifying the Child Support Enforcement Administration as the support enforcement agency of the State; extending the application of specified provisions of the Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act to include parties, pleadings, proceedings, and support orders of a foreign country; authorizing a tribunal of this State to exercise jurisdiction over a guardian or conservator under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {118975/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {118975/1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appeals
Attachments and Garnishments
Bonds
Courts
Debt Collection
Evidence
Family Law
Forgery
Fraud
Guardians
Hearings
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Judgments
Jurisdiction
Language
Legal Aid
Minors
Nonresidents
Notices
Paternity
Records
Registration
Securities
Support of Dependents
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Appeals
Attachments and Garnishments
Bonds
Courts
Debt Collection
Evidence
Family Law
Forgery
Fraud
Guardians
Hearings
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Judgments
Jurisdiction
Language
Legal Aid
Minors
Nonresidents
Notices
Paternity
Records
Registration
Securities
Support of Dependents
Telecommunications and Information Technology