MD SB944 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person or an agent, a representative, or a designee of the State or a local government from requiring, coercing, or compelling an individual to undergo a certain implanting of a certain identification device; authorizing an individual who is implanted with a subcutaneous identification device in violation of a certain provision of the Act to file a civil action in a certain court within 3 years after the date on which the identification device was implanted; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2018-03-30 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
2018-03-30 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {457676/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Civil Actions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Equipment
Fees
Health
Identification
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Representatives
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Health
Public Officials
State Employees
Civil Actions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Equipment
Fees
Health
Identification
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Representatives
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Health
Public Officials
State Employees