MD SB960 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the composition of the Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee to reflect changes made to the State's legislative districts.
Title
Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Composition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |