MD SB962 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain applicant for an alcoholic beverages license in Anne Arundel County to be a resident of the State, rather than the county, when an application for a license is filed; and providing that a certain license is valid only for as long as the resident applicant remains a resident of the State.
Title
Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Residency Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 12:35 p.m. |
2023-04-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {503829/1 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |