MD SB964 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Attorney General to take specified actions relating to investigations of alleged violations of laws relating to charitable organizations and charitable representatives; repealing specified authority for the legal counsel for the Office of the Secretary of State to administer oaths and examine an individual under oath; providing a specified enforcement action or other remedy is subject to specified immunity or limitation on liability; establishing the Charitable Enforcement Fund; etc.
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {918873/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Advertising
Attorney General
Business Regulation and Occupations
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Easements
Electronic Commerce
Evidence
Fees
Gifts
Harassment
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Oaths
Personal Property
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Secretary of State
Solicitation
Statutes of Limitation
Subpoenas
Violence
Attorney General
Business Regulation and Occupations
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Easements
Electronic Commerce
Evidence
Fees
Gifts
Harassment
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Oaths
Personal Property
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Secretary of State
Solicitation
Statutes of Limitation
Subpoenas
Violence