MD SB964 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to take certain reasonable steps to provide equal access to public services for individuals with limited English proficiency.
Title
County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-10) (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2019-04-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-10) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {944938/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Census
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Demographics
Education
Education, Boards of
Jurisdiction
Language
Literacy
Open Government
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Residency
Census
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Demographics
Education
Education, Boards of
Jurisdiction
Language
Literacy
Open Government
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Residency