MD SB967 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the salary of each associate judge of the Orphans' Court of Baltimore City to $74,000 and the annual salary of the Chief Judge of the Orphans' Court of Baltimore City to $84,500; altering the pension of specified associate judges of the Orphans' Court of Baltimore City and the pension of a Chief Judge of the Orphans' Court of Baltimore City; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and Pension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Judges
Orphans' Court
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Judges
Orphans' Court
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation