MD SB968 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a vendor of single family residential property to display or make available specified utility information under specified circumstances in a specified manner; authorizing a vendor to provide to prospective purchasers a specified home energy rating score; providing that specified information is provided without warranties; providing that the failure of a seller to provide specified information to the purchaser does not give the purchaser the right to rescind a contract; etc.
Title
Residential Property Sales - Disclosure of Utility Consumption
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (27-18) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-28 | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) 583720/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-28 | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) 883029/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments 328973/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-20 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Auditors and Audits
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Housing
Prices
Real Estate
Utilities
Auditors and Audits
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Housing
Prices
Real Estate
Utilities