MD SB968 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Task Force on Rural, Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service, in conducting a certain study, to solicit input from local governments, Internet service providers, and wireless service providers on identifying unserved and underserved rural areas of Maryland; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding ways Maryland counties can work together to obtain federal assistance to improve Internet, Broadband, wireless, and other cellular services and accessibility in rural areas of Maryland; etc.
Title
Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178 |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {647970/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Electronic Communication
Maps and Charts
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Counties
Electronic Communication
Maps and Charts
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology