MD SB971 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a regulation that increases a fee or fine that a unit is authorized to impose from taking effect until the General Assembly approves the increase through legislation that is enacted into law.
Title
Regulations - Fees and Fines - Legislative Approval Required
Sponsors
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Fees
Fines
General Assembly
Legislation
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Fees
Fines
General Assembly
Legislation
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures