MD SB971 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB423
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county treasurer, tax collector, or director of finance to provide a certificate enumerating certain taxes, assessments, and charges against a property and to establish certain procedures to facilitate the issuance of the certificate; requiring a collecting agent presented with a certificate to endorse a deed and establishing that this endorsement is sufficient authority for a transfer on the assessment books; authorizing a county or municipality to collect a fee of up to $55 for the issuance of a certain certificate; etc.
Title
Real Property - Recordation - Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Mary James [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-31 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Subjects
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Counties
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Evidence
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Public Officials
Real Property
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Counties
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Evidence
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Public Officials
Real Property
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 3 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 3 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |