MD SB975 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual to submit, and requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to accept, an application for a property tax exemption for a specific dwelling house that the individual intends to purchase before the individual purchases the dwelling house; requiring the Department, within 15 business days, to process the application and send the applicant a letter regarding preliminary approval or denial of the application; etc.
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {653321/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {943926/1 Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB809 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Subjects
Armed Forces
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Disabilities
Disabled
Exemptions
Notices
Property Tax
Residential Property
Spouses
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Disabilities
Disabled
Exemptions
Notices
Property Tax
Residential Property
Spouses
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |