ME LD1006 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow the Sale of Ethanol-free Gasoline Statewide
Title
An Act To Allow the Sale of Ethanol-free Gasoline Statewide
Sponsors
Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] | Rep. Randall Greenwood [R] | Rep. Abigail Griffin [R] | Rep. Kathy Javner [R] |
Rep. Richard Mason [R] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-04 | Joint | Reported Out: LTW |
2021-04-30 | Joint | LTW Approved by Chairs |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1006&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0744&item=1&snum=130 |