ME LD1102 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Reconstruction of Residential Structures on Sand Dunes
Title
An Act Regarding Reconstruction of Residential Structures on Sand Dunes
Sponsors
Sen. Seth Goodall [D] | Rep. Joan Welsh [D] | Rep. James Boyle [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] |
Rep. Charles Harlow [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #177 (Y: 83 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 177 (Yeas 83 - Nays 58 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-03 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2013-06-03 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-132). |
2013-05-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-132) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-20 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator Boyle of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed |