ME LD1291 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Establish a Grant Program to Provide for Statewide and Equitable Access to Experiential Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics Education
Title
An Act to Establish a Grant Program to Provide for Statewide and Equitable Access to Experiential Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics Education
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Edward Crockett [D] | Rep. Janice Dodge [D] | Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] |
Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Sen. Cameron Reny [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-15 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Accept The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) |
2023-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2023-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |