ME LD1635 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Avoid Unnecessary Removal of Land from the Maine Tree Growth Tax Law Program
Title
An Act To Avoid Unnecessary Removal of Land from the Maine Tree Growth Tax Law Program
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Damon [D] | Rep. Jane Eberle [D] | Rep. Gary Knight [R] | Rep. Nancy Smith [D] |
Rep. Thomas Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) in concurrence | |
2010-03-24 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-23 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-23 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-23 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) | |
2010-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2009. |