ME LD1681 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Gambling and Criminal History Record Checks
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Gambling and Criminal History Record Checks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland for the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs REFERRED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs, in concurrence. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2014-02-20 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative MacDONALD from the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS , in concurrence. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President Pro Tem. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2014-01-08 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1681&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1204&item=1&snum=126 |