ME LD1876 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Enhance Legislative Participation in the Governor's Use of Emergency Powers
Title
An Act to Enhance Legislative Participation in the Governor's Use of Emergency Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-23 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #455 (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #325 (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #325 (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 455 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 325 (Yeas 68 - Nays 61 - Absent 22 - Excused 0) |
2023-06-23 | House | On motion of Representative STOVER of Boothbay, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-21 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2023-05-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |