ME LD357 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Penalties for the Discharge of Sewage, Septic Fluids, Garbage, Sanitary Waste or Other Pollutants from Watercraft into Inland Waters
Title
An Act To Increase Penalties for the Discharge of Sewage, Septic Fluids, Garbage, Sanitary Waste or Other Pollutants from Watercraft into Inland Waters
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Kent Ackley [I] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] |
Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-59), in concurrence. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-59) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-59). |
2017-04-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-02-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |