ME LD786 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Eliminate the Penalty for School Administrative Units That Did Not Consolidate and Eliminate State Funding of Local Administrative Costs
Title
An Act To Eliminate the Penalty for School Administrative Units That Did Not Consolidate and Eliminate State Funding of Local Administrative Costs
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Johnson [R] | Rep. Stephen Lovejoy [D] | Rep. Mary Nelson [D] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] |
Rep. Richard Wagner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-05-10 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) On motion of Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) On motion of Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, TABLED pending REFERENCE. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=786&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0593&item=1&snum=125 |