ME LD930 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Allow Only Students of Female Gender to Participate in Women's and Girls' Scholastic Sports
Title
An Act to Allow Only Students of Female Gender to Participate in Women's and Girls' Scholastic Sports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #428 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #294 (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #294 (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 428 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 294 (Yeas 81 - Nays 65 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2023-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-02 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |