ME LD936 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Require Employers to Disclose Pay Ranges and Maintain Records of Employees' Pay History
Title
An Act to Require Employers to Disclose Pay Ranges and Maintain Records of Employees' Pay History
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Roeder [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] | Rep. Amy Kuhn [D] | Sen. David LaFountain [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Rep. Melanie Sachs [D] |
Rep. Erin Sheehan [D] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Suspend Rules (2/3) RC #775 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #213 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #113 (Y: 77 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #213 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #113 (Y: 77 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-05-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-723) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-723) thereto ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-723) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) was ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 775 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2024-04-18 | Senate | suspension of the Rules |
2024-04-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) in concurrence |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 213 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-255). |
2023-06-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 113 (Yeas 77 - Nays 65 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-04-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2023-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |