MI HB4017 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-18)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Pa 41'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-18)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Pa 41'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Food; other; persons donating food to nonprofit organizations or corporations that distribute donated food; provide immunity for. Amends title of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.1101 - 289.8111) & adds sec. 5104.
Title
Food; other; persons donating food to nonprofit organizations or corporations that distribute donated food; provide immunity for. Amends title of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.1101 - 289.8111) & adds sec. 5104.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Pa 41'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-06-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/3/2015 @ 4:38 Pm |
2015-06-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/3/2015 @ 3:37 Pm |
2015-05-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/21/2015 @ 1:12 Pm |
2015-05-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-05-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 194 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2015-03-26 | House | Transmitted |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 106 Nays 4 |
2015-03-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-03-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-01-20 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/16/2015 |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2015-01-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Farrington |