MI HB4020 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse or child neglect; expand to include K-12 coaches and volunteers. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Title
Children; protection; mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse or child neglect; expand to include K-12 coaches and volunteers. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Faris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Law And Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-01-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/12/2017 |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2017-01-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Pam Faris |