MI HB4035 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Animals: dogs; local government regulating a dog based on breed or perceived breed; prohibit. Creates new act.
Title
Animals: dogs; local government regulating a dog based on breed or perceived breed; prohibit. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 478 (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 478 (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2020-10-13 | House | Transmitted |
2020-10-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 478 Yeas 88 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-10-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-10-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-10-13 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-10-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-01-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/15/2019 |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2019-01-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Ellison |