MI HB4035 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Assigned Pa 1'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Assigned Pa 1'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: inland lakes; lake level assessment fee reimbursement; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 2150 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2150).
Title
Natural resources: inland lakes; lake level assessment fee reimbursement; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 2150 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2150).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 95 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 95 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned Pa 1'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 02/01/2022 01:46 Pm |
2022-02-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 02/01/2022 12:30 Pm |
2022-01-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 01/20/2022 01:34 Pm |
2022-01-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-01-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-01-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 3 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2021-03-25 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 95 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-03-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-01-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/27/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-01-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |