MI HB4119 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections: employees; personnel record release under the Bullard-Plawecki employee right to know act; expand to include corrections officers in certain situations. Amends secs. 7 & 9 of 1978 PA 397 (MCL 423.507 & 423.509). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4118'21
Title
Corrections: employees; personnel record release under the Bullard-Plawecki employee right to know act; expand to include corrections officers in certain situations. Amends secs. 7 & 9 of 1978 PA 397 (MCL 423.507 & 423.509). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4118'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Amended |
2021-04-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/03/2021 |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Anthony |