MI HB4148 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Assigned Pa 36'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Assigned Pa 36'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; guidelines for offenses under the extreme risk protection order act; enact. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 15e to ch. XVII. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0083'23
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; guidelines for offenses under the extreme risk protection order act; enact. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 15e to ch. XVII. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0083'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 67 (Y: 56 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 128 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 128 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Assigned Pa 36'23 |
2023-05-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/22/2023 04:54 Pm |
2023-05-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/22/2023 01:54 Pm |
2023-05-11 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/11/2023 11:06 Am |
2023-04-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2023-04-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-04-26 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 67 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2023-04-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2023-04-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Full Title |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 128 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-04-13 | House | Transmitted |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-04-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-04-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2023-04-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2023-03-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Stephanie Young |
Same As/Similar To
SB0083 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Assigned Pa 0038'23
Subjects
Civil procedure: injunctions
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
Weapons: firearms
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
Weapons: firearms