MI HB4162 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-20 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-20 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; examinations; administration of certain assessments; prohibit certain state agencies from requiring. Amends sec. 1279g of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1279g) & adds sec. 1279i.
Title
Education; examinations; administration of certain assessments; prohibit certain state agencies from requiring. Amends sec. 1279g of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1279g) & adds sec. 1279i.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 176 (Y: 85 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-06-20 | House | Transmitted |
2019-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 176 Yeas 85 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-19 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-06-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/07/2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2019-02-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced By Representative John Reilly |
Subjects
Education: examinations
Education: public school academies
Education: school districts
State agencies (existing): education
Education: public school academies
Education: school districts
State agencies (existing): education