MI HB4169 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Assigned Pa 33'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Assigned Pa 33'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing; option of placing individual in prison under the Holmes youthful trainee act; eliminate. Amends sec. 13, ch. II of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 762.13).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing; option of placing individual in prison under the Holmes youthful trainee act; eliminate. Amends sec. 13, ch. II of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 762.13).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Assigned Pa 33'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-05-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/20/2015 @ 1:44 Pm |
2015-05-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/20/2015 @ 1:16 Pm |
2015-05-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/12/2015 @ 2:24 Pm |
2015-05-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-05-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-03-12 | House | Transmitted |
2015-03-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 Yeas 99 Nays 11 |
2015-03-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-02-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2015 |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Marcia Hovey-wright |