MI HB4182 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-22 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-22 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; open meetings; physical presence required for vote; clarify. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.263).
Title
Civil rights; open meetings; physical presence required for vote; clarify. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.263).
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Rep. Laura Cox [R] | Rep. David Maturen [R] |
Rep. Martin Howrylak [R] | Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] | Rep. Kathy Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 462 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 196 (Y: 91 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 196 (Y: 91 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-22 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-10-22 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 462 Yeas 30 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2015-05-26 | House | Transmitted |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 196 Yeas 91 Nays 19 |
2015-05-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-05-14 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2015-05-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2015-02-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/12/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight And Ethics |
2015-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Amanda Price |