MI HB4207 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Printed Bill Filed 02/18/2015
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Printed Bill Filed 02/18/2015
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; advanced practice registered nurses; establish licensure requirements, revise requirements for nurse midwives, nurse practitioners, and clinical nurse specialists, and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 2701, 5119, 16125, 16161, 16163, 16216, 16231, 16231a, 16315, 16327, 17201, 17210, 17211, 17212, 17221, 17607, 17708, 17745, 17820, 17822, 18301 & 20201 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2701 et seq.) & adds secs. 17202, 17210a, 17211a, 17214 & 17221a.
Title
Health occupations; advanced practice registered nurses; establish licensure requirements, revise requirements for nurse midwives, nurse practitioners, and clinical nurse specialists, and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 2701, 5119, 16125, 16161, 16163, 16216, 16231, 16231a, 16315, 16327, 17201, 17210, 17211, 17212, 17221, 17607, 17708, 17745, 17820, 17822, 18301 & 20201 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2701 et seq.) & adds secs. 17202, 17210a, 17211a, 17214 & 17221a.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/18/2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-02-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Ken Yonker |
Same As/Similar To
SB0068 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3
Subjects
Health occupations: advanced practice registered nurses
Health occupations: nurses
Health: occupations
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): community health
Health occupations: nurses
Health: occupations
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): community health
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2015-HB-4207 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2015-HIB-4207.htm |