MI HB4218 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-30 - Assigned Pa 189'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-30 - Assigned Pa 189'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; payment and collection; eligibility for property tax deferment on agricultural lands; clarify. Amends sec. 51 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.51).
Title
Property tax; payment and collection; eligibility for property tax deferment on agricultural lands; clarify. Amends sec. 51 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.51).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-30 | Assigned Pa 189'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-30 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2009 @ 1:00 Pm | |
2009-12-30 | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2009 @ 11:25 Pm | |
2009-12-15 | Presented To The Governor 12/14/2009 @ 3:04 Pm | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-12-10 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2009-12-10 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2009-12-10 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-12-10 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 688 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-12-09 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-12-09 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-10-27 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-10-27 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-27 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-03-19 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2009-03-18 | Transmitted | |
2009-03-18 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 Yeas 110 Nays 0 | |
2009-03-18 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-03-18 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-03-18 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-03-18 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-02-11 | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-02-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced By Representative Dudley Spade |