MI HB4225 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2011
Pending: House Oversight, Reform, And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2011
Pending: House Oversight, Reform, And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; hours and wages; reference to repealed law; eliminate. Amends sec. 8 of 1974 PA 338 (MCL 125.1608). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4224'11
Title
Labor; hours and wages; reference to repealed law; eliminate. Amends sec. 8 of 1974 PA 338 (MCL 125.1608). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4224'11
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2011 |
2011-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2011-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Macgregor |
Same As/Similar To
SB0096 (Same As) 2011-02-01 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development
Subjects
Construction, contracts
Economic development, economic development corporations
Labor, fair employment practices
Labor, hours and wages
Economic development, economic development corporations
Labor, fair employment practices
Labor, hours and wages
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4225 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4225.htm |