MI HB4226 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2011
Pending: House Oversight, Reform, And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2011
Pending: House Oversight, Reform, And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; hours and wages; reference to repealed law; eliminate. Amends secs. 503, 523, 553 & 1311e of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.503 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4224'11
Title
Labor; hours and wages; reference to repealed law; eliminate. Amends secs. 503, 523, 553 & 1311e of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.503 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4224'11
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2011 |
2011-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2011-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradford Jacobsen |
Same As/Similar To
SB0097 (Same As) 2011-02-01 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4226 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4226.htm |