MI HB4226 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Assigned Pa 125'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Assigned Pa 125'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; economic development corporations; certified technology park distinct geographic areas; increase. Amends sec. 12b of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2162b).
Title
Economic development; economic development corporations; certified technology park distinct geographic areas; increase. Amends sec. 12b of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2162b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 311 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 79 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 79 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | House | Assigned Pa 125'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-07-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/15/2015 @ 4:40 Pm |
2015-07-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/15/2015 @ 4:22 Pm |
2015-07-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/7/2015 @ 9:41 Am |
2015-06-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 311 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2015-06-03 | House | Transmitted |
2015-06-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 Yeas 79 Nays 30 |
2015-06-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-02 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-06-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-02-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/25/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2015-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Daniela Garcia |
Same As/Similar To
SB0111 (Same As) 2015-02-17 - Referred To Committee On Transportation