MI HB4291 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Assigned Pa 49'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Assigned Pa 49'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2010-2011. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2010-2011. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 199 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | House | Assigned Pa 49'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-05-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/27/2011 @ 9:24 Am |
2011-05-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/26/2011 @ 3:36 Pm |
2011-05-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/19/2011 @ 2:50 Pm |
2011-05-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-05-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 199 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2011-04-13 | House | Transmitted |
2011-04-13 | House | Title Amended |
2011-04-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2011-04-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-04-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-04-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2011-04-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-02-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/18/2011 |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2011-02-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Chuck Moss |