MI HB4293 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Family law: marriage and divorce; marriage entered into by a person under 18 years of age; void. Amends title & sec. 1 of 1921 PA 352 (MCL 551.51). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0212'23, HB 4296'23, SB 0211'23, SB 0210'23
Title
Family law: marriage and divorce; marriage entered into by a person under 18 years of age; void. Amends title & sec. 1 of 1921 PA 352 (MCL 551.51). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0212'23, HB 4296'23, SB 0211'23, SB 0210'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-06-21 | House | Transmitted |
2023-06-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 Yeas 104 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-06-21 | House | Amended |
2023-06-21 | House | Amendment(s) Reconsidered |
2023-06-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-20 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2023-06-20 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2023-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-03-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/16/2023 |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-03-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Kara Hope |
Same As/Similar To
SB0212 (Same As) 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0072'23 With Immediate Effect
HB4296 (Same As) 2023-09-19 - Assigned Pa 123'23 With Immediate Effect
SB0211 (Same As) 2023-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
SB0210 (Same As) 2023-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
HB4296 (Same As) 2023-09-19 - Assigned Pa 123'23 With Immediate Effect
SB0211 (Same As) 2023-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
SB0210 (Same As) 2023-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice